EP4054652 - SYNTHETIC MODIFIED RNA AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANGI, Lior c/o One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | 02 /
HADAS, Yoav c/o One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | 03 /
SULTANA, Nishat c/o One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | Boynton, Juliette Alice, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20883694.0 | 06.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020US59482 | Priority number, date | US201962932255P | 07.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962932255 P | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021092440 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054652 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N9/16, C12N15/62 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
C12N9/18 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (US);
A61P1/16 (US);
A61P9/00 (US);
C12N15/62 (EP);
A01K2207/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE MODIFIZIERTE RNA UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2022/37] | English: | SYNTHETIC MODIFIED RNA AND USES THEREOF | [2022/37] | French: | ARN MODIFIÉ SYNTHÉTIQUE ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2013151665 (MODERNA THERAPEUTICS [US]) [X] 7 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1-6,8-13 [Y] 14,15; | [YA]WO2018035253 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [Y] 7,14,15 * claims 1,11,12,15 * [A] 1-6,8-13; | [YA] - YOSHIMURA ET AL, "Functional polymorphisms in carboxylesterase1A2 (CES1A2) gene involves specific protein 1 (Sp1) binding sites", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM NL, (20080306), vol. 369, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2008.02.120, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 939 - 942, XP022572215 [Y] 7,14,15 * figure 1 * [A] 1-6,8-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2008.02.120 | [YA] - BRUXEL E M ET AL, "Association of a carboxylesterase 1 polymorphism with appetite reduction in children and adolescents with attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder treated with methylphenidate", THE PHARMACOGENOMICS JOURNAL, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1038/TPJ.2012.25, ISSN 1470-269X, (20120612), pages 476 - 480, (20120612), XP037747193 [Y] 7,14,15 * page 479, column l, paragraph 2 * [A] 1-6,8-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/tpj.2012.25 | [YA] - KIRTIKA H ASRANI ET AL, "Optimization of mRNA untranslated regions for improved expression of therapeutic mRNA", vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1080/15476286.2018.1450054, ISSN 1555-8584, (20180326), pages 756 - 762, RNA BIOLOGY 2011 JAN-FEB,, URL: https://www.tandfonline.com/doi/pdf/10.1080/15476286.2018.1450054, (20180326), XP002793471 [Y] 7,14,15 * abstract * [A] 1-6,8-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15476286.2018.1450054 | [YA] - RASMUSSEN HENRIK BERG ET AL, "Carboxylesterase 1 genes: systematic review and evaluation of existing genotyping procedures", DRUG METABOLISM AND PERSONALIZED THERAPY, (20180328), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.1515/dmpt-2017-0023, ISSN 2363-8907, pages 3 - 14, XP093090420 [Y] 7,14,15 * page 5 * [A] 1-6,8-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/dmpt-2017-0023 | [IP] - SULTANA NISHAT ET AL, "Optimization of 5' Untranslated Region of Modified mRNA for Use in Cardiac or Hepatic Ischemic Injury", MOLECULAR THERAPY- METHODS & CLINICAL DEVELOPMENT, GB, (20200601), vol. 17, doi:10.1016/j.omtm.2020.03.019, ISSN 2329-0501, pages 622 - 633, XP055936600 [IP] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.omtm.2020.03.019 | International search | [X]US2004005564 (MAURO VINCENT P [US], et al) [X] 46-49 * entire document *; | [A]US2004076954 (CALDWELL JEREMY S [US], et al) [A] 1-11,46-49 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011150774 (RIVIER MICHEL [FR], et al) [Y] 4-11 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2015105191 (JUNTENDO EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION [JP], et al) [Y] 11 * entire document *; | [XY]WO2019077001 (CUREVAC AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * entire document * [Y] 4-11; | [A]US2019117733 (CHIEN KENNETH R [US], et al) [A] 1-11,46-49* entire document * |