EP4055143 - CRISPR CAS SYSTEMS AND LYSOGENY MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Locus Biosciences, Inc. 523 Davis Drive Suite 350 Morrisville NC 27560 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUSTEROUT, David G. 523 Davis Drive, Suite 350 Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | 02 /
GAROFOLO, Paul M. 523 Davis Drive, Suite 350 Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | 03 /
SELLE, Kurt 523 Davis Drive, Suite 350 Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | 04 /
TUSON, Hannah Hewitt 523 Davis Drive, Suite 350 Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20883927.4 | 05.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020US59213 | Priority number, date | US201962931793P | 06.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962931793 P | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021092249 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055143 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12N7/00, C12N7/01, C12N9/22, C12N15/11, C12N15/90 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
C12N15/74 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K35/76 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/113 (EP);
C12N15/73 (EP);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2795/10131 (EP);
C12N2795/10132 (EP);
C12N2795/10143 (EP);
C12N2795/10343 (US);
C12N2795/10371 (US);
C12N2800/80 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | CRISPR-CAS-SYSTEME UND LYSOGENIE-MODULE | [2022/37] | English: | CRISPR CAS SYSTEMS AND LYSOGENY MODULES | [2022/37] | French: | SYSTÈMES CRISPR CAS ET MODULES DE LYSOGÉNIE | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 05.06.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to failure to file the sequence listing | 23.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2023 | Decision despatched | The application was refused due to non-payment of the late furnishing fee for the sequence listing | 23.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2023 | Decision despatched | 23.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014199767 (BARRANGOU RODOLPHE [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 10, 28-34, 48-54 * entire document *; | [A]US2017260546 (QIMRON EHUD [IL], et al) [A] 1-3, 10, 28-34, 48-54* entire document *; | [XY]US2018155729 (BEISEL CHASE LAWRENCE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * entire document * [Y] 3, 10; | [Y]WO2019067322 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [Y] 3, 10 * entire document *; | [A]US2019230936 (CLUBE JASPER [GB]) [A] 1-3, 10, 28-34, 48-54 * entire document * |