EP4044527 - MULTI-SERVICE FORWARDING METHOD, SWITCH, ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT AND READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Ning ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Despag-Straße 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20884015.7 | 03.11.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020CN126160 | Priority number, date | CN20191181160 | 07.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911081160 | [2022/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021088802 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044527 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, // H04L49/354, H04L45/50 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H04L12/4645 (EP);
H04L45/50 (EP,CN);
H04L12/465 (CN);
H04L47/825 (CN);
H04L49/354 (EP,CN);
H04L49/602 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | H04L12/723 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WEITERLEITUNG MEHRERER DIENSTE, SCHALTER, ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT UND LESBARES MEDIUM | [2022/33] | English: | MULTI-SERVICE FORWARDING METHOD, SWITCH, ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT AND READABLE MEDIUM | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT MULTI-SERVICE, COMMUTATEUR, ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT LISIBLE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2022 | Translation filed | 14.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 02.02.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1408655 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1, 2, 5(a), 5(b) * * paragraph [0047]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0072]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0009] * [Y] 7,8 [I] 2-6; | [IAY]CN101026532 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028]; figures 3, 4 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraphs [0037] , [0043]; figure 3 * [A] 2-6 [Y] 7,8; | [A]US2009154470 (KUC ZENON [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046]; figures 5, 6 * |