EP4043862 - METHOD FOR ADJUSTING POSITION, MICROPARTICLE ANALYSIS DEVICE, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAI, Shinichi c/o Sony Imaging Products & Solutions Inc., 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KAJIHARA, Junji c/o Sony Imaging Products & Solutions Inc., 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
KITA, Koji c/o Sony Imaging Products & Solutions Inc., 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
SAKAMOTO, Naohisa c/o Sony Imaging Products & Solutions Inc., 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuya c/o Sony Imaging Products & Solutions Inc., 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20884203.9 | 11.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020JP34432 | Priority number, date | JP20190201577 | 06.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019201577 | [2022/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021090574 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043862 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, G01N37/00, G01N35/08 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G01N15/1459 (EP);
G01N15/1434 (EP,US);
G01N15/0227 (EP);
G01N15/1404 (US);
G01N15/1433 (EP);
G01N15/1484 (EP);
G01N15/149 (EP);
G01N2015/0238 (EP);
G01N2015/0288 (EP);
G01N2015/0294 (EP);
G01N2015/1006 (EP);
G01N2015/1027 (EP);
G01N2015/1422 (US);
G01N2015/144 (US);
G01N2015/1452 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSTELLEN DER POSITION, MIKROTEILCHEN-ANALYSE-VORRICHTUNG UND PROGRAMM | [2022/33] | English: | METHOD FOR ADJUSTING POSITION, MICROPARTICLE ANALYSIS DEVICE, AND PROGRAM | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE POSITION, DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE DE MICROPARTICULES ET PROGRAMME | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2022 | Translation filed | 20.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 13.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62112034 (CANON KK) [A] 3-5 * figures 1-4 * * page 197, paragraph last *; | [A]US2015057787 (MURAKI YOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0176] ** figures 1, 5-13 *; | [XI]WO2018175411 (NANOCELLECT BIOMEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6-15 * figures Fig. 24A-D * * paragraph [0166] - paragraph [0170] * * paragraph [0003] * [I] 3-5; | [A]US2019020825 (MASUDA SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * | International search | [X]JPH0481640 (TOA MEDICAL ELECTRONICS) [X] 1-20 * , claims, p. 2, lower right column, line 7 to p. 3, lower left column, line 4 *; | [A]JPH04188042 (TOA MEDICAL ELECTRONICS) [A] 1-20; | [A]JPH0513454B (CANON INC.) [A] 1-20 * , claims *; | [A]JP2013210308 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-20 * , paragraph [0040] *; | [A]JP5727629B (CONSTITUTION MEDICAL INC.) [A] 5 * , paragraph [0030] *; | [A]WO2018067770 (IRIS INT INC [US])[A] 1-20; | [A] - Santos A., Ortiz De Solórzano C., Vaquero J. J., Peña J. M., Malpica N., Del Pozo F., "Evaluation of autofocus functions in molecular cytogenetic analysis", Journal of Microscopy, (19971200), vol. 188, no. 3, pages 264 - 272, XP055823557 [A] 5 * , item 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2818.1997.2630819.x | by applicant | JP2012127922 | JP2016191715 | - A. SANTOS et al., "Evaluation of autofocus functions in molecular cytogenetic analysis", Journal of Microscopy, (19970000), vol. 188, doi:10.1046/j.1365-2818.1997.2630819.x, XP055823557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2818.1997.2630819.x |