EP3951989 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jung Min LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LIM, Young Min LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
YEOM, Chul Eun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Chul Haeng LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
LEE, Jung Min Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
LIM, Young Min Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
03 /
YEOM, Chul Eun Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Chul Haeng Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20885006.5 | 04.11.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020KR15296 | Priority number, date | KR20190141680 | 07.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20190141680 | KR20200145192 | 03.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200145192 | [2022/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021091215 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951989 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0567, H01M10/0525 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/052 (CN);
H01M2300/0025 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H01M10/0567, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | NICHTWÄSSRIGE ELEKTROLYTLÖSUNG FÜR EINE LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2022/06] | English: | NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2022/06] | French: | SOLUTION ÉLECTROLYTIQUE NON AQUEUSE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LA COMPRENANT | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2021 | Translation filed | 04.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN107017432 (NINGDE AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY LTD) [Y] 1-4,6-10* paragraph [0025]; claim 8; compound 5 *; | [YA]US10355313 (PEŃA HUESO JOSÉ ADRIÁN [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-10 * tables 1,2 * [A] 5 | International search | [Y]WO2012074300 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See claims 1, 2 and 4; and paragraphs [0051]-[0053]. *; | [Y]KR20170018975 (SILATRONIX INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * See claims 1, 11, 27 and 28; and paragraphs [0084], [0155] and [0156]. *; | [Y]KR101765190B (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.) [Y] 7,8* See claims 1, 6 and 7; and paragraph [0054]. *; | [Y]KR20170128238 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * See claims 1 and 6; and paragraphs [0112] and [0113]. *; | [Y]KR20190054920 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See claims 1, 4 and 8; and paragraphs [0043], [0046] and [0047]. * |