EP4040589 - CROSS-LINKED SEPARATOR FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, COMPRISING CROSS-LINKED POLYOLEFIN, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Sung-Jae LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
MUN, Sung Cik LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Joo-Sung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Bong-Tae LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
BAE, Won-Sik LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
AN, Hyo-Sun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20885010.7 | 06.11.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020KR15558 | Priority number, date | KR20190142909 | 08.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20190142909 | [2022/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021091330 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040589 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/403, H01M50/409, H01M50/40, H01M10/052, H01M50/417, H01M50/446, H01M50/489, H01M50/494, H01M50/411, H01M50/449 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H01M50/403 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/494 (EP,KR);
H01M50/40 (CN);
H01M10/052 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M50/409 (CN);
H01M50/411 (EP,CN);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/431 (US);
H01M50/443 (KR);
H01M50/446 (EP,KR);
H01M50/449 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/46 (KR);
H01M50/489 (EP);
H01M50/491 (KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | H01M50/409, H01M50/40, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | VERNETZTER SEPARATOR FÜR LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, MIT VERNETZTEM POLYOLEFIN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/32] | English: | CROSS-LINKED SEPARATOR FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, COMPRISING CROSS-LINKED POLYOLEFIN, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/32] | French: | SÉPARATEUR RÉTICULÉ POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM COMPRENANT UNE POLYOLÉFINE RÉTICULÉE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2022 | Translation filed | 02.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 19.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN103811702 (FOSHAN JINHUI HI TECH OPTOELECTRONIC MATERIAL CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * all embodiments;; claim all *; | [X]US2018097256 (MODEKI AKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-14* paragraphs [0108] - [0117]; example 1; claim all * | International search | [Y]KR20150071378 (SAMSUNG TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS [KR]) [Y] 4,10; | [Y]KR20160043768 (UNIST ULSAN NAT INST SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY [KR]) [Y] 4,10 * See claims 1 and 2; and paragraphs [0052] and [0091]. *; | [A]KR20180039898 (ULSAN NAT INST SCIENCE & TECH UNIST [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR101955911B (W SCOPE KOREA CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See entire document. *; | [A]JP2019514185 (SHANGHAI ENERGY NEW MATERIALS TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-14* See entire document. * | by applicant | KR20190142909 |