Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021150555 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016749329 | 22.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021096705 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019113532 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762596078 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019113346 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762596019 | 07.12.2017 | US201815994976 | 31.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019113340 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815995002 | 31.05.2018 | US201762596077 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024186482 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | US202217945790 | 15.09.2022 | US202418439397 | 12.02.2024 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024145686 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017090631 | 05.11.2020 | US201762596019 | 07.12.2017 | US201962933034 | 08.11.2019 | US201815995002 | 31.05.2018 | US202418407031 | 08.01.2024 | US201815994976 | 31.05.2018 | US202217833389 | 06.06.2022 | US202117484706 | 24.09.2021 | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | US202217945790 | 15.09.2022 | US202016897543 | 10.06.2020 | US202117161333 | 28.01.2021 | US201762596077 | 07.12.2017 | US202117464435 | 01.09.2021 | US202016749329 | 22.01.2020 | US201916430298 | 03.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022209227 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816213973 | 07.12.2018 | US202217696566 | 16.03.2022 | US201762596077 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021226251 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016749329 | 22.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11923545 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | B2 | US2022393174 | 08.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117464435 | 01.09.2021 | US202016749329 | 22.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11916228 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2024 | B2 | US2022376233 | 24.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117484706 | 24.09.2021 | US202217833389 | 06.06.2022 | US201815995002 | 31.05.2018 | US201762596077 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11901543 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2024 | B2 | US2023187604 | 15.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | US202217945790 | 15.09.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11901500 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2024 | B2 | US2020303768 | 24.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762596019 | 07.12.2017 | US202016897543 | 10.06.2020 | US201815994976 | 31.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11870055 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | B2 | US2021159485 | 27.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117161333 | 28.01.2021 | US201916430298 | 03.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11695106 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2023 | B2 | US2022231271 | 21.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217712840 | 04.04.2022 | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | US202016745404 | 17.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11450841 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2022 | B2 | US2021143392 | 13.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11355748 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2022 | B2 | US2022093917 | 24.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117484706 | 24.09.2021 | US201815995002 | 31.05.2018 | US201762596077 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11296311 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2021143394 | 13.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | US202016745404 | 17.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11283069 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2022 | B2 | US2019181441 | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816213973 | 07.12.2018 | US201762596078 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11133498 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2021 | B2 | US2019181434 | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815995002 | 31.05.2018 | US201762596077 | 07.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10916763 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2021 | B2 | US2020381707 | 03.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916430298 | 03.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10686214 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2020 | B2 | US2019181492 | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762596019 | 07.12.2017 | US201815994976 | 31.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220100642 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | WO2020US58274 | 30.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220097973 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202017090631 | 05.11.2020 | WO2020US59365 | 06.11.2020 | US201962933034 | 08.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200096816 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201815995002 | 31.05.2018 | US201762596077 | 07.12.2017 | WO2018US64287 | 06.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4059070 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2024 | A4 | EP4059070 | 21.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | WO2020US58274 | 30.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3721493 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815995002 | 31.05.2018 | US201762596077 | 07.12.2017 | WO2018US64287 | 06.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3721490 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762596019 | 07.12.2017 | WO2018US64295 | 06.12.2018 | US201815994976 | 31.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114651342 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201916681401 | 12.11.2019 | WO2020US58274 | 30.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114630930 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202017090631 | 05.11.2020 | WO2020US59365 | 06.11.2020 | US201962933034 | 08.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111433947B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2023 | B | CN111433947 | 17.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201815995002 | 31.05.2018 | US201762596077 | 07.12.2017 | WO2018US64287 | 06.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4055217 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2024 | A4 | EP4055217 | 14.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017090631 | 05.11.2020 | WO2020US59365 | 06.11.2020 | US201962933034 | 08.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021092348 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017090631 | 05.11.2020 | US201962933034 | 08.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11916218 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2024 | B2 | US2021143396 | 13.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017090631 | 05.11.2020 | US201962933034 | 08.11.2019 |