EP4055369 - OPTICAL SENSOR WINDOW CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entegris, Inc. 129 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAST, Tracy 11544 Kensington Drive Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20886068.4 | 20.10.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020US56510 | Priority number, date | US201962931409P | 06.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962931409 P | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021091689 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055369 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/15, G01N21/41, B08B3/02, G01N21/85, G02B27/00 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G01N21/15 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B08B3/02 (EP,CN,KR);
B08B3/04 (KR,US);
B08B5/02 (CN,KR);
G01N21/4133 (EP,KR);
G01N21/85 (EP,KR);
G02B27/0006 (EP,KR);
G01N2021/151 (EP,CN,KR);
G01N2021/155 (KR,US);
G01N2021/4153 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | G01N21/15, G01N21/59, G01N21/41 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | FENSTERREINIGER FÜR OPTISCHEN SENSOR | [2022/37] | English: | OPTICAL SENSOR WINDOW CLEANER | [2022/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE DE FENÊTRE DE CAPTEUR OPTIQUE | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004230243 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [Y] 5,12 * paragraphs [0022] - [0023]; figure 1; claim 2 *; | [XYI]US2005081893 (NILSEN BJARNE [NO]) [X] 1,2,6-10,13,14 * paragraphs [0031] - [0035]; figures 1, 3 * [Y] 3-5,11,12 [I] 15; | [Y]EP1302584 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,4,11 * paragraph [0022]; figure 3 *; | [A]CN108993960 (DING BAOLIANG, et al) [A] 1-15* claim 5 *; | [A]US11174751 (KULKARNI AMBARISH JAYANT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 7, paragraph 3 * | International search | [A]JP2004151086 (DU PONT) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0042]-[0048] and figure 1 *; | [X]US2005081893 (NILSEN BJARNE [NO]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0008], [0031]-[0036] and figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2011180694 (LEUTHOLD KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0044]-[0068] and figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP2982964 (ECOLAB USA INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * claims 1, 2 and figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US9599557 (GIGLER ALEXANDER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-19* claim 1 and figure 1 * |