EP4055005 - LIQUID MELPHALAN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Corporate House, Near Sola Bridge S. G. Highway, Thaltej Ahmedabad - 380054, Gujarat / IN | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOKSHI, Nimitt Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Astron Division Plot 457/458 Sarkhej-Bavla Highway Matoda Tal.: Sanand Gujarat Ahmedabad 382210 / IN | 02 /
SHAH, Rushabh Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Astron Division Plot 457/458 Sarkhej-Bavla Highway Matoda Tal.: Sanand Gujarat Ahmedabad 382210 / IN | 03 /
GOBADE, Nagnath G Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Astron Division Plot 457/458, Sarkhej-Bavla Highway Matoda Tal.: Sanand Gujarat Ahmedabad 382210 / IN | 04 /
UPADHYAY, Kamal Kumar Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Astron Division Plot 457/458, Sarkhej-Bavla Highway Matoda Tal.: Sanand Gujarat Ahmedabad 382210 / IN | 05 /
GEORGE, Alex K Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Astron Division Plot 457/458, Sarkhej-Bavla Highway Matoda Tal.: Sanand Gujarat Ahmedabad 382210 / IN | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Intas Pharmaceuticals World Trade Center Moll de Barcelona, s/n Edifici Est, 6a planta 08039 Barcelona / ES | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20886165.8 | 04.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020IB60334 | Priority number, date | IN201921044683 | 04.11.2019 Original published format: IN201921044683 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021090183 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055005 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/36, A61K9/08, A61P35/00, A61K47/02, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/20, A61K31/198 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A61K47/02 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/12 (EP);
A61K47/20 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C227/44, C07C229/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | C07C229/36, A61K9/08, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Extension states | BA | 30.05.2022 | ME | 30.05.2022 | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE MELPHALANZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/37] | English: | LIQUID MELPHALAN COMPOSITION | [2022/37] | French: | COMPOSITION LIQUIDE DE MELPHALAN | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 10.09.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 10.09.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]RU2060031 (ONKOLOGICHESKIJ NAUCHNYJ TS [RU]) [X] 1-10* examples 1-4; claim 1 *; | [X] - DAVID Q. MA ET AL, "Comparative effects of (SBE)7m-?-CD and HP-?-CD on the stability of two anti-neoplastic agents, melphalan and carmustine", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (20000201), vol. 89, no. 2, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200002)89:2<275::AID-JPS15>3.0.CO;2-C, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 275 - 287, XP055200060 [X] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200002)89:2<275::AID-JPS15>3.0.CO;2-C | International search | [XY]US2010311838 (PIPKIN JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 10 *paras 77-79,85; examples 4,6; abstract; para 98; paras 85-86; para 73; para 153* [Y] 4-5,7; | [XY]US2014213650 (PIPKIN JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 10 *paras 78,87,89,98; example 1; table in example 12; paras 13,27-28,52,78,98,117* [Y] 4-5,7; | [X]WO2017085696 (LEIUTIS PHARM PVT LTD [IN])[X] 10; | [XY]US2018193255 (CHANDRASHEKHAR KOCHERLAKOTA [IN], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-10 *paras 19-22; para 23, 34; table 2; para 36; para 1; paras 29-34,36; examples 1-5* [Y] 4-5,7 |