EP3906208 - UNLOADING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/45] | INDEPENDENT FLOOR STORAGE SYSTEM | ||
[2024/08] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laidig Systems, Inc. 14535 Dragoon Trail Mishawaka, IN 46544 / US | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENOVESE, Michael Ryan 2331 Basin Street South Bend, Indiana 46516 / US | 02 /
LINDENMAN, Thomas Walter 61051 Ironwood Road South Bend, Indiana 46614 / US | 03 /
AMICK, Alan C. 52122 Fieldstone Lane Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | 04 /
SARELL, Andrew Pierce 29661 River Shore Lane Elkhart, Indiana 46516 / US | [2024/25] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
GENOVESE, Michael Ryan South Bend, Indiana 46516 / US | ||
02 /
LINDENMAN, Thomas Walter South Bend, Indiana 46614 / US | |||
03 /
AMICK, Alan C. Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | |||
04 /
SARELL, Andrew Pierce Elkhart, Indiana 46516 / US | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 20886684.8 | 09.11.2020 | [2021/45] | WO2020US59613 | Priority number, date | US201916683601 | 14.11.2019 Original published format: US201916683601 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021096788 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3906208 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3906208 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/46, B65D88/30, B65D88/32, // B65G33/12 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
B65G65/463 (EP,US);
A01F25/2018 (EP);
B65G65/466 (EP);
B65G2814/0316 (US);
B65G33/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | B65G65/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTLADESYSTEM | [2024/08] | English: | UNLOADING SYSTEM | [2024/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉCHARGEMENT | [2024/08] |
Former [2021/45] | UNABHÄNGIGES BODENLAGERSYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/45] | INDEPENDENT FLOOR STORAGE SYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/45] | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE À PLANCHER INDÉPENDANT | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 11.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4040218 (STANELLE KARL-HEINZ); | [A]BE1000608 (WELGRO BV); | [A]US2011058905 (HAMEL STEFAN [DE], et al); | [XA]US2012275889 (HOPPEL STEFFON [US]); | [A]CA3040314 (WESTCAP AG CORP [CA]) | International search | [A]US2017081836 (THIESSEN LESTER JAMES [CA]); | [AP]US2020031571 (ROSUMOWITSCH MICHAEL [CA]); | [AP]US2020115150 (FROESE ANDREW [CA], et al) | Examination | US4112634 | US8672194 | by applicant | US218 | US4040 | US2012275889 |