EP4059893 - WRUTZITE-TYPE MANGANESE OXIDE PARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZAMA, Takuya c/o STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 2-9-13, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 02 /
TAMURA, Wataru c/o STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 2-9-13, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 03 /
MIYAKE, Yasuyuki c/o STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 2-9-13, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 04 /
MORIYAMA, Kenji c/o STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 2-9-13, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 05 /
MURAMATSU, Atsushi c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY, 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 06 /
KANIE, Kiyoshi c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY, 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20887728.2 | 09.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020JP41704 | Priority number, date | JP20190205644 | 13.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019205644 | [2022/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021095682 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059893 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01G45/02, H01M4/36, H01M4/505, B82Y30/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H01M4/505 (EP);
C01G45/02 (EP,CN,US);
B82Y40/00 (CN);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C01P2002/30 (US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,CN);
C01P2002/76 (EP);
C01P2002/77 (EP,CN,US);
C01P2002/84 (EP,CN);
C01P2002/85 (EP,CN);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/32 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | C01G45/00, H01M4/36, H01M4/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | MANGANOXIDTEILCHEN VOM WURTZITTYP UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/38] | English: | WRUTZITE-TYPE MANGANESE OXIDE PARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2022/38] | French: | PARTICULES D'OXYDE DE MANGANÈSE DE TYPE WRUTZITE ET LEUR MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2022 | Translation filed | 06.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 11.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101104949 (UNIV ZHEJIANG [CN]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2002529352 (NANOGRAM CORPORATION) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0165] *; | [A]JP2011207674 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * example 6 *; | [A]KR20120021632 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [A] 1-16 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2015010033 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH) [A] 1-16* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]CN107441512 (UNIV HEFEI TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-16 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A] - NAM, K. M. et al., "New Crystal Structure: Synthesis and Characterization of Hexagonal Wurtzite MnO", Journal of the American Chemical Society, (20120523), vol. 134, no. 20, doi:10.1021/ja302440y, pages 8392 - 8395, XP055823911 [A] 1-16 * abstract, page 8392, left column, paragraph [0002] to page 8393, right column, paragraph [0001], fig. 1-2, Supporting Information * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja302440y | [A] - NAM, K. M. et al., "Chemical Approach to a New Crystal Structure: Phase Control of Manganese Oxide on a Carbon Sphere Template", Chemistry An Asian Journal, (20141009), vol. 9, no. 12, doi:10.1002/asia. 201403021, pages 3525 - 3532, XP055823914 [A] 1-16 * abstract, page 3526, left column, paragraph [0002] to page 3531, right column, paragraph [0004], fig. 3-4, 8, Supporting Information * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/asia.201403021 | [A] - NAM, K. M. et al., "Non-native transition metal monoxide nanostructures: unique physicochemical properties and phase transformations of CoO, MnO and ZnO", NPG Asia Materials, (20170324), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:10.1038/am.2017.38, page e364, XP055823917 [A] 1-16 * , right column, paragraph [0001] to page 8, right column, paragraph [0001], fig. 8, scheme 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/am.2017.38 | by applicant | - KI MIN NAM et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20120000), vol. 134, pages 8392 - 8395 |