EP4059503 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT AND PROPHYLACTIC AGENT FOR FUNCTIONAL GASTROINTESTINAL DISORDERS AND XEROSTOMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shinyaku Co., Ltd. 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHINAGA, Ryohei c/o NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | 02 /
KAMATA, Maki c/o NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | 03 /
ASAO, Yasunori c/o NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | 04 /
FUKUI, Tomomi c/o NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | [2023/06] |
Former [2022/38] | 01 /
YOSHINAGA, Ryohei c/o NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | ||
02 /
KURITA, Maki c/o NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | |||
03 /
ASAO, Yasunori c/o NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | |||
04 /
FUKUI, Tomomi c/o NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20888347.0 | 12.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020JP42259 | Priority number, date | JP20190205436 | 13.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019205436 | [2022/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021095805 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059503 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496, A61K31/4545, A61K31/497, A61P1/02, A61P1/04, A61P1/10, A61K31/437, A61P29/00 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A61P1/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/4545 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/496 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/497 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P1/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | A61K31/496, A61K31/4545, A61K31/497, A61P1/02, A61P1/04, A61P1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Extension states | BA | 10.06.2022 | ME | 10.06.2022 | Validation states | KH | 10.06.2022 | MA | 10.06.2022 | MD | 10.06.2022 | TN | 10.06.2022 | Title | German: | THERAPEUTIKUM UND PROPHYLAKTIKUM FÜR FUNKTIONELLE GASTROINTESTINALE STÖRUNGEN UND XEROSTOMIE | [2022/38] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENT AND PROPHYLACTIC AGENT FOR FUNCTIONAL GASTROINTESTINAL DISORDERS AND XEROSTOMIA | [2022/38] | French: | AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE ET AGENT PROPHYLACTIQUE POUR DES TROUBLES GASTRO-INTESTINAUX FONCTIONNELS ET LA XÉROSTOMIE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2022 | Translation filed | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007039297 (ALMIRALL LAB [ES], et al) [A] 1-14* claim 1 *; | [I]WO2008007900 (DAE WOONG PHARMA [KR], et al) [I] 1-14 * examples 42,58; claims 1,2,4,6 *; | [E]EP3792260 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14 * paragraph [0298]; example all; claims 1-10 * | International search | [A]WO2005115399 (NEUROGEN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * 1, 35, 39 *; | [A]JP2009542802 [A] 1-14 * 1, 4, 6 *; | [A]WO2011018894 (RAQUALIA PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * 1, 7, 10 *; | [A]WO2018118736 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * 2 30-3 5, 130 4-132 1, 1-21 *; | [PXA]WO2019216294 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 9-14 * 1-11, 0293, 1-4, 6, 8, 10, 11, 14, 16, 20, 37, 38, 42, 68 *[PA] 1-8 | by applicant | - Gastroenterology, (20160000), vol. 150, no. 6, pages 1257 - 1261 | - Advances in Clinical Experimental Medicine, (20160000), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 199 - 206 | - Pharmacolical Reviews, (19980000), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 279 - 290 | - British Journal of Pharmacology, (20060000), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 565 - 578 | - Trends in Pharmacological Sciences, (20170000), vol. 38, no. 9, pages 837 - 847 | - Nature, (20120000), vol. 482, pages 552 - 556 | - Acta gastroenterologica latinoamericana, (19910000), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 3 - 9 |