EP4058579 - METHOD OF DETECTION OF FIBRIN CLOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I-ZUM-X Pty Ltd. 10 Prince Edward Parade Hunters Hill, NSW 2110 / AU | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUTOVICH, George 10 Prince Edward Parade Hunters Hill, New South Wales 2110 / AU | 02 /
VEEDU, Rakesh Naduvile 13 Benningfield Road Bullcreek, Western Australia 6149 / AU | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20888402.3 | 12.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020AU51228 | Priority number, date | AU20190904291 | 14.11.2019 Original published format: AU 2019904291 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021092651 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4058579 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/115, C12N15/10, C12Q1/6813 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
C12N15/1048 (EP,AU,US);
C12N15/115 (EP,AU,US);
C12Q1/6811 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6813 (AU,US);
C12N2310/16 (EP,AU,US);
C12N2310/3231 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3517 (EP,US);
C12N2310/531 (AU);
C12N2320/13 (AU,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6811, C12Q2525/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON FIBRINGERINNSEL | [2022/38] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTION OF FIBRIN CLOTS | [2022/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CAILLOTS DE FIBRINE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9634875 (NEXSTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al)[A] 0; | [X]US6127119 (STEPHENS ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-2,4-16 * Examples 2, 8 and 9; Tables 4-5; Column 6-7, bridging paragraph; Column 22, line 36-39 *; | [X]WO2019094315 (APTAMER DIAGNOSTIC INC [US]) [X] 1-2,4-13 * pp 17-19, para 57-68; pp 20-24, para 71-76; pp 25-26, para 79-81; p 27, para 83. Example 1: p 37, para 114; p 38, para 115; pp 41-42; para 127. Figure 7 *; | [X]CN110423755 (4TH MILITARY MEDICAL UNIV CHINESE PLA) [X] 1-2,4-13 * & English language EPO machine translation [0010, 0011, 0019, 0024, 0036-0039, 0046-0054, 0059, 0091-0095]; Figures 11-14 * |