EP4016721 - BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Sung Gyu LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Hangjune LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Soo Ho LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20888677.0 | 12.10.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020KR13828 | Priority number, date | KR20190146925 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20190146925 | [2022/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021096071 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016721 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/50, H01M50/20 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H01M50/507 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/502 (KR);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/209 (CN);
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (US);
H01M50/258 (CN);
H01M50/50 (KR);
H01M50/514 (EP);
H01M50/516 (US);
H01M50/536 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL UND BATTERIEPACK DAMIT | [2022/25] | English: | BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK INCLUDING SAME | [2022/25] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE ET BLOC-BATTERIE LE COMPRENANT | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2022 | Translation filed | 15.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 29.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]KR20180119372 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0025] - [0062]; figures 1-6 * [A] 5,6; | [X]US2019074557 (SHIN EUN-GYU [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * paragraph [0052]; figures 1-9 *; | [X]KR20190056013 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,10 * figure 5 *; | [X]KR20190122055 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1,10* figures 5, 8 *; | [X]KR20190124022 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * figures 3-8 * | International search | [Y]KR20160077762 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0048]-[0054] and figure 7. *; | [A]JP2018055821 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-10 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20180108461 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20190094668 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0046], claim 7 and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2019288264 (FUJITA GORO [JP]) [Y] 3-8 * See paragraph [0075] and figures 9(A)-10(D). * |