EP4061428 - PH RESPONSIVE COMPOSITIONS, FORMULATIONS, AND METHODS OF IMAGING A TUMOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onconano Medicine, Inc. 181 Grand Avenue, Suite 225 Southlake, TX 76092 / US | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Tian 181 Grand Ave, Ste 225 Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | 02 /
JAYALAKSHMI, Yalia 181 Grand Ave, Ste 225 Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | 03 /
HALL, Keith A. 181 Grand Ave, Ste 225 Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | 04 /
MADAJEWSKI, Brian 181 Grand Ave, Ste 225 Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | 05 /
KAPLAN, Hargita 181 Grand Ave, Ste 225 Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Smart, Jessica Ann, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20888772.9 | 17.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020US60910 | Priority number, date | US201962937141P | 18.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962937141 P | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021101905 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061428 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, G01N33/50, G01N33/58, C07C69/54, C08F293/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/84 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08F220/34 (KR);
A61K49/0054 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K49/0032 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K49/0082 (KR,US);
C07D209/42 (EP);
C08F220/382 (KR);
C08F293/005 (EP);
C08F299/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | A61K49/00, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | AUF PH-ANSPRECHENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, FORMULIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABBILDUNG EINES TUMORS | [2022/39] | English: | PH RESPONSIVE COMPOSITIONS, FORMULATIONS, AND METHODS OF IMAGING A TUMOR | [2022/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS SENSIBLES AU PH, FORMULATIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR IMAGER UNE TUMEUR | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 07.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017143852 (GAO JINMING [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * Figs. 1, 15, 76A *; | [A]WO2019094906 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1-5 * p.17, formula (I) *; | [E]WO2020243217 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [E] 1-15* the whole document *; | [YP] - BENNETT ZACHARY T. ET AL, "Detection of Lymph Node Metastases by Ultra-pH-Sensitive Polymeric Nanoparticles", THERANOSTICS, AU, (20200101), vol. 10, no. 7, doi:10.7150/thno.41239, ISSN 1838-7640, pages 3340 - 3350, XP093059770 [YP] 1-15 * Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7150/thno.41239 | [Y] - ZHEN LI ET AL, "Ultra-pH-sensitive indocyanine green-conjugated nanoprobes for fluorescence imaging-guided photothermal cancer therapy", NANOMEDICINE: NANOTECHNOLOGY, BIOLOGY, AND MEDICINE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20190401), vol. 17, doi:10.1016/j.nano.2019.02.001, ISSN 1549-9634, pages 287 - 296, XP055763757 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; p. 288,col.2, par. 3; p. 290, col.1, par. 3; fig. 1b, p.292, col.1, par. 1-col.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nano.2019.02.001 | [Y] - LUO MIN ET AL, "A STING-activating nanovaccine for cancer immunotherapy", NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, London, vol. 12, no. 7, doi:10.1038/nnano.2017.52, ISSN 1748-3387, (20170701), pages 648 - 654, URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/nnano.2017.52.pdf, XP055916800 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; suppl. fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nnano.2017.52 | [A] - XINPENG MA ET AL, "Ultra-pH-Sensitive Nanoprobe Library with Broad pH Tunability and Fluorescence Emissions", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20140729), vol. 136, no. 31, doi:10.1021/ja5053158, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 11085 - 11092, XP055427451 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja5053158 | International search | [A]US2013131354 (LANGHALS HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-3, 23-27 and 40 * entire dpcument *; | [A]US2017049911 (GAO JINMING [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 23-27 and 40 * entire document *; | [A]US2017143852 (GAO JINMING [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 23-27 and 40 * entire documet especailly figure 1, figure 15 A&B and figure 76A . *; | [A]WO2019094906 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1-3, 23-27 and 40 * entire document especially page 41 formula *; | [EX]WO2020243217 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [EX] 1-3, 23-27 and 40* entire document especially claims 1-26 * |