EP4062247 - COMPUTER SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ESTIMATING CHANGES IN FUGITIVE EMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Molex, LLC 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, IL 60532 / US | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Wenfeng c/o Molex, LLC 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, IL 60532 / US | 02 /
LIN, Ling-Ying c/o Molex, LLC 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, IL 60532 / US | 03 /
NEDOSSEKINA, Alissa c/o Molex, LLC 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, IL 60532 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20888777.8 | 20.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020US61407 | Priority number, date | US201962938972P | 22.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962938972 P | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021102211 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4062247 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G06Q50/10, G06Q10/20, G06Q50/02, G06Q50/26 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G05B23/0235 (EP);
G01N33/0075 (US);
G01M3/04 (US);
G05B23/0272 (EP);
G06Q10/20 (EP);
G06Q30/018 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | G05B23/02, G06Q50/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | RECHNERSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHÄTZUNG VON ÄNDERUNGEN BEI FLÜCHTIGEN EMISSIONEN | [2022/39] | English: | COMPUTER SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ESTIMATING CHANGES IN FUGITIVE EMISSIONS | [2022/39] | French: | SYSTÈMES INFORMATIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ESTIMATION DES CHANGEMENTS D'ÉMISSIONS FUGITIVES | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1881386 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2-4 *; | [X]WO2011060418 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1,3A-3C, 5 * | International search | [Y]US6058102 (DRYSDALE R SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 16,18-19,26-30,35 * column 15, lines 22-31 *; | [Y]US2012016597 (SUTAN ANWAR [GB]) [Y] 11-35 * paragraphs [0026], [0079] *; | [A]US2018128794 (SUTAN ANWAR [GB]) [A] 1-35* paragraphs [0063]-[0079]; and figure 2 *; | [A]US2018330594 (HUMMER GREGORY J [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * paragraphs [0010]-[0025] *; | [A]WO2019068178 (DYNACERT INC [CA]) [A] 1-10 |