EP4044328 - PACKAGING FOR FLEXIBLE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND FLEXIBLE SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UHM, In-Sung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Yong-Hee LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Byoung-Hyo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
JANG, Min-Chul LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Jung-Hun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20889804.9 | 20.11.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020KR16534 | Priority number, date | KR20190151647 | 22.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20190151647 | [2022/33] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021101343 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044328 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4044328 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/12, B32B27/28, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B27/36, B32B27/38, B32B27/40, H01M50/105, H01M50/119, H01M50/121, H01M50/124, H01M50/129, H01M50/136 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H01M50/105 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/129 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/121 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/20 (KR);
B32B27/28 (EP);
B32B27/281 (EP);
B32B27/283 (EP);
B32B27/285 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/38 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
H01M50/119 (EP);
H01M50/122 (KR,US);
H01M50/1243 (EP);
H01M50/1245 (EP);
H01M50/133 (KR,US);
H01M50/136 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/141 (KR);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/20 (EP);
B32B2255/28 (EP);
B32B2264/108 (KR);
B32B2307/7242 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2439/00 (KR);
B32B2439/46 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | H01M50/10, B32B27/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG FÜR FLEXIBLE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND FLEXIBLE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2022/33] | English: | PACKAGING FOR FLEXIBLE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND FLEXIBLE SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2022/33] | French: | EMBALLAGE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE SOUPLE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE SOUPLE LE COMPRENANT | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2022 | Translation filed | 11.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 28.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20130037329 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0027] , [0029] *; | [A]US2016329533 (TAJIMA RYOTA [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0060] , [0063] , [0064] , [0066] , [0068] , [0070] , [0072] , [0078] , [0135] * * figures 1A-C * * claims 7,9 *; | [A] - VASILIOS GEORGAKILAS ET AL, "Functionalization of Graphene: Covalent and Non-Covalent Approaches, Derivatives and Applications", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (20121114), vol. 112, no. 11, doi:10.1021/cr3000412, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 6156 - 6214, XP055140605 [A] 1-10 * section 3.2; pages 6175-6176 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr3000412 | International search | [Y]KR101325530B (KOREA ADVANCED INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY et al.) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0021], [0025]-[0028] and [0038]. *; | [A]KR20140015927 (YOULCHON CHEMICAL CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See claims 1-8. *; | [A]KR20140094960 (UNIV YONSEI WONJU INDUSTRY ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR]) [A] 1-10* See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20160029717 (AMOGREENTECH CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0121]-[0145] and claim 1. *; | [A]KR20170028111 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See claims 1-3 and 8-13. * | by applicant | KR20190151647 |