EP4063480 - INSPECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IRISAWA Kaku c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | 02 /
SETO Yoshihiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | 03 /
SHIMIZU Hitoshi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | 04 /
MIYATO Takahiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20889859.3 | 14.10.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020JP38808 | Priority number, date | JP20190208890 | 19.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019208890 | [2022/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021100367 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063480 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4063480 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, G01N21/59, G01N21/83, G01N33/579, G01N21/27, C12M1/34, G01N21/47 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
G01N21/253 (EP);
G01N33/579 (EP,CN);
G01N33/54373 (US);
C12M1/34 (EP);
C12M41/48 (CN);
G01N21/01 (CN);
G01N21/49 (CN);
G01N21/51 (US);
G01N21/59 (US);
G01N21/78 (EP);
G01N21/82 (EP);
G01N21/83 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | C12M1/34, G01N21/01, G01N21/49, G01N21/83, G01N33/579 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/39] | English: | INSPECTION DEVICE | [2022/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2022 | Translation filed | 08.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5073029 (EBERLY JAMES P [US], et al); | [X]FR2668597 (LABSYSTEMS OY [FI]); | [A]EP2407788 (KOWA CO [JP]); | [X]US2014011266 (WEBSTER BENJAMIN MASTERMAN [GB], et al); | [A]US2018252646 (YING JACKIE Y [SG], et al); | [A]EP3382398 (SYSMEX CORP [JP]); | [XI]WO2019214971 (BYONOY GMBH [DE]); | International search | [Y]JPH09159671 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD); | [A]JP2011002379 (KOWA CO); | [A]JP2012154815 (UNIV IWATE MEDICAL, et al); | [XYA]JP2013528359 ; | [A]JP2014215298 (PALL CORP); | [Y]JP2018009953 (SYSMEX CORP); | [A]US2019113514 (YE JING YONG [US], et al) | by applicant | JPH09159671 | JP2011002379 | JP2014215298 |