EP4034287 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OPERATING PASSIVE NITROGEN OXIDE ADSORBERS IN EXHAUST AFTERTREATMENT SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins, Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Jinyong 2333 Shadow Bend Drive Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 02 /
SONG, Xiaobo 127 Westbrook Court Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 03 /
JIN, Xing 1245 Thornton Court, Apt. D Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 04 /
SCHMIDT, David 7230 Carrie Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46237 / US | 05 /
QIU, Lu 7019 Winter Crest Drive Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 06 /
ORTH-FARRELL, Lisa A. 12835 East 100 North Columbus, Indiana 47203 / US | 07 /
YUAN, Ying 2069 Pawnee Court E Columbus, Indiana 47203 / US | 08 /
NARULA, Manik 288 Westbrook Court Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 09 /
HENRICHSEN, Lars K. 12220 E. Meadows Lane Columbus, Indiana 47203 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | CSY Herts Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20890112.4 | 16.11.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020US60718 | Priority number, date | US201962938499P | 21.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962938499 P | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021101837 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034287 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, F01N13/00, F01N13/16 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
F01N3/0814 (EP,CN);
F01N3/2803 (CN,US);
F01N3/2892 (CN,US);
B01D53/02 (US);
B01D53/30 (CN);
B01D53/9418 (EP,US);
B01D53/9431 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/9481 (US);
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F01N11/00 (EP,CN);
F01N3/0842 (EP,CN,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,CN);
F01N9/00 (CN,US);
F02D29/06 (CN,US);
B01D2251/2062 (EP);
B01D2251/2067 (EP);
B01D2253/108 (US);
B01D2253/112 (US);
B01D2253/1124 (US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP);
B01D2255/1023 (EP);
B01D2255/104 (EP);
B01D2255/2065 (EP);
B01D2255/50 (EP);
B01D2255/91 (EP);
B01D2257/404 (US);
B01D2258/01 (CN);
B01D2259/4566 (US);
B01D53/9422 (EP);
F01N2370/04 (CN,US);
F01N2410/04 (EP,CN);
F01N2550/03 (EP,CN);
F01N2560/06 (EP,CN);
F01N2590/11 (EP,CN);
F01N2900/10 (CN,US);
F01N2900/1602 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN PASSIVER STICKOXIDADSORBER IN ABGASNACHBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2022/31] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OPERATING PASSIVE NITROGEN OXIDE ADSORBERS IN EXHAUST AFTERTREATMENT SYSTEMS | [2022/31] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER DES ADSORBEURS D'OXYDE D'AZOTE PASSIFS DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE POST-TRAITEMENT D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102010014468 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]); | [X]EP3428415 (FPT IND SPA [IT]); | [E]CN110878712 (WEICHAI POWER CO LTD) | International search | [A]US2008296908 (UTSUMI ATSUKO [JP]); | [A]US2009008374 (FOSBINDER DANIEL C [US]); | [Y]US2015158019 (RAJARAM RAJ RAO [GB], et al); | [A]US2015377102 (YEZERETS ALEKSEY [US], et al); | [XYA]US2017226911 (HAAS MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2017226970 (FORD KIM [GB], et al); | [A]WO2018183268 (CUMMINS INC [US]) |