EP4063298 - STACKER CRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAI Jun c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd., Ise Plant, 600-10 Shimono-cho Ise-shi, Mie 516-0003 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA Kazuhiro c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd., Inuyama Plant, 2, Aza- Nakajima, Oaza-Hashizume Inuyama-shi, Aichi 484-8502 / JP | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20890702.2 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020JP36048 | Priority number, date | JP20190211508 | 22.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019211508 | [2022/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021100313 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063298 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B66F9/07, H01L21/677 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
B66F9/07 (EP,CN,US);
B65G1/04 (IL);
B66F9/08 (US);
B65G1/0407 (EP,CN,US);
B66F9/07504 (CN);
B66F9/0755 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | B65G1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | STAPELKRAN | [2022/39] | English: | STACKER CRANE | [2022/39] | French: | GRUE EMPILEUSE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2022 | Translation filed | 21.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 26.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08225111 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD); | [Y]DE19704019 (ZURHEIDE FRANK [DE]); | [Y]DE102005007226 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]JP2007291682 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]US2015159369 (CHEN SHENG-JIN [TW], et al) | International search | [A]JPH06213216 (DAIFUKU KK); | [A]JPH06247510 (DAIFUKU KK); | [A]JPH07112805 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD); | [A]JPH0986825 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR TECH); | [A]JPH09124110 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS); | [A]WO2013161037 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2014024642 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) | by applicant | JPS4826941B |