EP4061187 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING FOODSTUFF COMPLETION TIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states June Life, Inc. 1620 Folsom Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Wiley 649 Front Street 100 San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Higgs, Jonathan Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | Application number, filing date | 20890754.3 | 20.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020US61491 | Priority number, date | US201962937996P | 20.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962937996 P | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021102254 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061187 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/06, A47J36/32 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A47J36/321 (EP,US);
A23L5/10 (EP,US);
A47J36/32 (EP,US);
G01K7/42 (EP);
A47J2202/00 (US);
G01K2207/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | A47J37/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DER FERTIGSTELLUNGSZEIT VON NAHRUNGSMITTELN | [2022/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING FOODSTUFF COMPLETION TIME | [2022/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE DÉLAI D'ACHÈVEMENT DE SUBSTANCE ALIMENTAIRE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 20.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2019234617 (BHOGAL NIKHIL [US], et al); | [Y]CN110236408 (JOYOUNG CO LTD) | International search | [Y]US4415790 (DIESCH BRADFORD J [US], et al); | [A]US2006218057 (FITZPATRICK KERIEN W [US], et al); | [Y]US2013052310 (STANFORD ROBERT NELSON [US]); | [Y]US2013084369 (SMRKE ALBIN [SI]); | [Y]US2013269539 (POLT B ROBERT [US]); | [A]US2017224161 (LI QING [NL], et al); | [Y]US2019110638 (LI XIAOCHUN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2019234617 |