EP4063004 - HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nipro Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Toshiaki c/o NIPRO CORPORATION, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Kyoetsu c/o NIPRO CORPORATION, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 03 /
SADAHIRO, Kaname c/o NIPRO CORPORATION, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Toshinari c/o NIPRO CORPORATION, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20891334.3 | 19.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020JP43214 | Priority number, date | JP20190209763 | 20.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019209763 | [2022/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021100811 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063004 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/02, B01D69/08, B01D67/00 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
B01D63/031 (EP);
B01D67/0083 (EP);
B01D67/0086 (EP);
B01D69/084 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | B01D63/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | HOHLFASERMEMBRANMODUL | [2022/39] | English: | HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE MODULE | [2022/39] | French: | MODULE DE MEMBRANE À FIBRES CREUSES | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2022 | Translation filed | 20.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 15.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2009034 (MONSANTO CO); | [XD]JPS6422308 (ORGANO KK); | [XD]JP2003079721 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [XY]US2003155294 (HEILMANN KLAUS [DE], et al); | [Y]EP1634639 (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [XY]EP2815807 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE]); | [XY]EP3102312 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE]); | [XY]EP3388139 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE]) | International search | [XY]JPS6422308 (ORGANO KK); | [XY]JP2003079721 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]WO2004094047 (ASAHI MEDICAL CO [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2010046587 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [XY]JP2016528948 ; | [XY]EP3427814 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE]) | by applicant | JPS523819B | JPS57194007 | JPS6422308 | JP2003079721 | JP2016528948 |