EP4063134 - THERMAL HEAD AND THERMAL PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAJI, Narito c/o Kyocera Corporation, 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 02 /
IWAMOTO, Yosuke c/o Kyocera Corporation, 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 03 /
MATSUBARA, Ryohei c/o Kyocera Corporation, 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20891337.6 | 19.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020JP43259 | Priority number, date | JP20190211866 | 22.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019211866 | [2022/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021100822 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063134 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/335, B41J2/345 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/345 (EP,US);
B41J2/335 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | THERMODRUCKKOPF UND THERMODRUCKER | [2022/39] | English: | THERMAL HEAD AND THERMAL PRINTER | [2022/39] | French: | TÊTE THERMIQUE ET IMPRIMANTE THERMIQUE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2022 | Translation filed | 19.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 20.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60110470 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2014022325 (MIYAMURA KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016114289 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [Y]JP2018051973 (TOSHIBA HOKUTO ELECTRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0243058 (NHK SPRING CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JPH07323592 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003], [0012]-[0013], [0019]-[0033], fig. 1-8 *; | [A]US6028619 (SAITA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2018051973 (TOSHIBA HOKUTO ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003]-[0004], [0010]-[0023], fig. 1-3 * | by applicant | JPH0617939 |