EP4064858 - PEF SYSTEM FOR THE TREATMENT OF BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Opticept Technologies AB Kalkstensvägen 16 224 78 Lund / SE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LILJA, Per Östanväg 102 216 17 LIMHAMN / SE | 02 /
RHODIN, Nils Bryggaregatan 17 227 36 LUND / SE | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20891942.3 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020SE51136 | Priority number, date | SE20190051368 | 28.11.2019 Original published format: SE 1951368 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021107853 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064858 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23L5/30, A23L3/32 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
A23L3/32 (EP,US);
A23L5/30 (EP,US);
B65G15/16 (US);
B65G19/04 (US);
B65G2812/02871 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | A23L5/30, A23L3/32, B01J19/08, B65G15/06, B65G15/02, B65G15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | PEF-SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEM MATERIAL | [2022/40] | English: | PEF SYSTEM FOR THE TREATMENT OF BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL | [2022/40] | French: | SYSTÈME PEF POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN MATÉRIAU BIOLOGIQUE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 14.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE3911959 (DOEVENSPECK HEINZ [DE], et al); | [Y]US5802959 (BENSON CLARK K [US], et al); | [Y]DE102008024065 (KARLSRUHE FORSCHZENT [DE]); | [XYI]US2017035078 (BIGLIONE NICOLE [US], et al); | [XYI]CA3051721 (DEUTSCHES INST FUR LEBENSMITTELTECHNIK E V [DE]); | [XYI]CA3069907 (ELEA VERTRIEBS UND VERMARKTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH [DE]); | [Y]EP2895014 (ZWANENBERG FOOD GROUP B V [NL]) | International search | [X]DE3911959 (DOEVENSPECK HEINZ [DE], et al); | [DA]EP2941968 (ESTRELLA MAARUD HOLDING AS [NO]); | [DA]US2018368451 (BHASKAR AJAY RAJESHWAR [US], et al); |