EP4007232 - RESOURCE SCHEDULING METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Bo ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Kewen ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Mozzi, Matteo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20891970.4 | 12.11.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020CN128420 | Priority number, date | CN201911192927 | 28.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911192927 | [2022/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021104033 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4007232 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4007232 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/10, H04L67/60, H04L65/40 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H04L67/10 (EP,CN);
H04L67/60 (EP,CN);
G06F9/5055 (US);
G06F9/45558 (US);
G06F9/4881 (US);
G06F9/5072 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESSOURCENPLANUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2022/22] | English: | RESOURCE SCHEDULING METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | [2022/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE PLANIFICATION DE RESSOURCES | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2022 | Translation filed | 28.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US10191778 (YANG DONGYI [US], et al); | [A]US2019356693 (CAHANA ZVI [IL], et al) |