EP4065950 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VAPORISING LIQUIFIED NATURAL GAS FOR MEASUREMENT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synertec Pty Ltd Ground Floor 2-6 Railway Parade Camberwell VIC 3124 / AU | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARROLL, Michael James 20 Lingwell Road Hawthorn East, Victoria 3123 / AU | 02 /
SANCHEZ, Sandra Mercedes Neira Unit 2, 55 Mitta Street Box Hill, Victoria 3129 / AU | 03 /
BORG, Christopher 50 Emu Flats Road Wildwood, Victoria 3429 / AU | 04 /
MORONY, Lee Matthew 11-3/74 Queens Road Melbourne, Victoria 3004 / AU | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Europe LLP Neumarkter Straße 18 81673 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20892600.6 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020AU51290 | Priority number, date | AU20190904471 | 27.11.2019 Original published format: AU 2019904471 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021102522 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065950 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, G01N1/44, F17C13/02 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/225 (EP,AU,KR);
F17C13/02 (AU,KR);
G01N1/4022 (EP,KR);
G01N1/44 (US);
F17D3/10 (US);
F17D5/00 (US);
G01N33/0016 (AU,KR);
G01N33/28 (US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,AU);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,AU,KR);
F17C2223/033 (EP,AU,KR);
F17C2225/036 (AU,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERDAMPFEN VON VERFLÜSSIGTEM ERDGAS FÜR DESSEN MESSUNG | [2022/40] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VAPORISING LIQUIFIED NATURAL GAS FOR MEASUREMENT THEREOF | [2022/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE VAPORISATION DE GAZ NATUREL LIQUÉFIÉ POUR LA MESURE DE CELUI-CI | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 27.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN110045041 (CNOOC GAS & POWER GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-15* figures and EPO machine translation * | International search | [X]US3487692 (COOK HAROLD L JR) [X] 1-28 * Col. 1, lines 13-42; col. 2, lines 24-43; col. 3, line 24-col. 4, line 38; fig. 2 *; | [X]CN108152428 (UNIV ZHEJIANG OCEAN) [X] 1-28* Abstract; paragraphs 24-25, 43-47, 51, 54-56; figs. 2-4, 7 *; | [X]US10126214 (ST AMANT III VALMOND JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1-28 * Abstract; col. 9, lines 6-10; col. 10, lines 34-39; figs. 9-10; claims 1-5 * |