EP4067859 - TISSUE TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Biosystems Nussloch GmbH Heidelberger Strasse 17-19 69226 Nussloch / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Chun Building 1, 258 Jin Zang Rd. Jinqiao Export Processing Zone Pudong Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | DehnsGermany Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20893578.3 | 24.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020CN131122 | Priority number, date | CN20192263022U | 26.11.2019 Original published format: CN 201922063022 U | [2022/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021104258 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067859 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, G01N1/31 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G01N1/31 (EP);
G01N1/34 (US);
G01N1/44 (US);
G01N2001/315 (EP);
G01N2035/00425 (EP);
G01N2035/0401 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | G01N1/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | GEWEBEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/40] | English: | TISSUE TREATMENT DEVICE | [2022/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE TISSU | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2022 | Translation filed | 22.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 11.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4569647 (MCCORMICK JAMES B [US]); | [I]US5947167 (BOGEN STEVEN A [US], et al); | [A]US6244474 (LOEFFLER HERBERT H [US]); | [Y]US8394322 (WINDEYER VICTOR CAMFIELD [AU], et al); | [A]CN103293034 (XI JINHUA); | [A]US2015023848 (SHARMA SHREE G [US], et al); | [A]US2016003719 (IM WOOK BIN [KR]); | [A]CN108414329 (LI CHANGSHOU) |