EP4067110 - RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONE, Ryota c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, 1-1, Kyobashi 3- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20893596.5 | 23.09.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020JP35868 | Priority number, date | JP20190217351 | 29.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019217351 | [2022/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021106337 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067110 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4067110 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08C19/25, C08L15/00, C08K3/013, C08C19/22, C08C19/44, C08L7/00, C08F236/10, C07F7/18 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP);
C08C19/25 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08C19/22 (EP);
C08C19/44 (EP);
C08F236/10 (EP);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K3/36 (US);
C07F7/1804 (EP);
Y02T10/86 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F236/10, C08F4/48 (EP);
C08L15/00, C08L7/00, C08L57/02, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K3/22, C08K5/09, C08K3/06, C08K5/47, C08K5/47, C08K5/31 (EP);
C08L7/00, C08L15/00, C08L57/02, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K3/22, C08K5/09, C08K3/06, C08K5/47, C08K5/47, C08K5/31 (EP);
C08F236/06, C08F212/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/40] | B60C1/00, C08C19/25, C08L15/00, C08K3/013 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND REIFEN | [2022/40] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE | [2022/40] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC ET BANDAGE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2022 | Translation filed | 20.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 29.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3536720 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2019216645 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | International search | [Y]WO2008050851 (JSR CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2009113546 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al); | [YA]WO2013031599 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2017014140 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]WO2018092716 (ZEON CORP [JP]); | [YA]JP2018534401 ; | [Y]JP2019515073 ; | [Y]US2019233547 (MUN MIN SIK [KR], et al) | by applicant | JP4478262B | JP2018131560 |