EP4066660 - ATOMIZATION ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd. 1-3 F, Building C Gaoxin Industry Zone Tangwei Village Fuyong Town Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Jun Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park Fuyong Str, Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
LEI, Baoling Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park Fuyong Str, Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Wenpeng Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park Fuyong Str, Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Ming Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park Fuyong Str, Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 05 /
XU, Zhongli Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park Fuyong Str, Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 06 /
LI, Yonghai Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park Fuyong Str, Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20894540.2 | 26.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020CN131870 | Priority number, date | CN20192261877U | 26.11.2019 Original published format: CN 201922061877 U | [2022/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021104390 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4066660 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24F40/42, A24F40/46 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
A24F40/46 (EP,US);
A24F40/42 (US);
A24F40/10 (US);
A24F40/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBERANORDNUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2022/40] | English: | ATOMIZATION ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2022/40] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ATOMISATION ET CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | Translation filed | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 24.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014109921 (CHEN ZHIPING [CN]) [X] 1-7,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0060] * [I] 8-11; | [XI]EP3292773 (SHENZHEN SMOORE TECHNOLOGY LTD [CN]) [X] 1-4,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-13 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0059] * [I] 8-11; | [A]US2018070647 (MONSEES JAMES [US], et al) [A] 8-11 * abstract * * figures 1-14 * * paragraph [0164] - paragraph [0265] *; | [A]US2019014826 (THORENS MICHEL [CH], et al) [A] 8-11 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0112] *; | [A]CN209436269U (CHANGZHOU PAITENG ELECTRONIC TECH SERVICE CO LTD) [A] 8-11 * abstract * * figures 1-16 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0089] *; | [A]CN110338466 (SHENZHEN SMOORE CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-17 ** paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0078] *; | [XI]WO2019206985 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * page 6 - page 16 * [I] 8-11 |