EP4065758 - A CIRCULAR LOOM FOR MANUFACTURING DOUP FABRIC AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOHIA CORP LIMITED D-3/A, Panki Industrial Estate Kanpur, Uttar Pradesh 208022 / IN | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOHIA, Gaurav D3/A, Panki Industrial Estate Kanpur, 208 022 / IN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20894754.9 | 23.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020IB61027 | Priority number, date | IN201911048244 | 26.11.2019 Original published format: IN201911048244 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021105847 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065758 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D03D37/00, D03D3/02, D03D19/00, D03C7/02 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
D03C7/02 (EP);
D03D19/00 (EP);
D03D3/02 (EP);
D03D37/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | D03D37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | KREISWEBSTUHL ZUM HERSTELLEN VON DOUBLIERGEWEBE UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DESSELBEN | [2022/40] | English: | A CIRCULAR LOOM FOR MANUFACTURING DOUP FABRIC AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING IT | [2022/40] | French: | MÉTIER À TISSER CIRCULAIRE POUR FABRIQUER UN TISSU DE GAZE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH657163 (HUEMER FRANZ XAVER); | [XAY]AT386847B (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]); | [XAY]US4846229 (STARLINGER-HUEMER FRANZ X [AT]); | [XA]DE10231066 (CETEX CHEMNITZER TEXTILMASCHIN [DE]); | [Y]CN202644031U (LUO ZHONGGAO) | International search | [A]WO8200480 (TORII WINDING MACHINE CO [JP]); | [A]CH657163 (HUEMER FRANZ XAVER); | [A]US4846229 (STARLINGER-HUEMER FRANZ X [AT]) | by applicant | AT386847B | US4846229 | DE10231066 |