Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022413061 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019213256 | 26.11.2019 | WO2020JP31046 | 18.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2021106285 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019213256 | 26.11.2019 | WO2020JP31046 | 18.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114746762 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019213256 | 26.11.2019 | WO2020JP31046 | 18.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4068545 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2023 | A4 | EP4068545 | 05.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019213256 | 26.11.2019 | WO2020JP31046 | 18.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021106285 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019213256 | 26.11.2019 |