EP3884487 - MAMR RECORDING HEAD WITH HIGH DAMPING TRAILING SHIELD SEED LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Digital Technologies, Inc. 5601 Great Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95119 / US | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONCHAROV, Alexander c/o Western Digital Technologies Inc. 5601 Great Oaks Parkway San Jose California 95119 / US | 02 /
ASIF BASHIR, Muhammad c/o Western Digital Technologies Inc. 5601 Great Oaks Parkway San Jose California 95119 / US | 03 /
VANDERHEIJDEN, Petrus Antonius c/o Western Digital Technologies Inc. 5601 Great Oaks Parkway San Jose California 95119 / US | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 20894912.3 | 18.03.2020 | [2021/39] | WO2020US23425 | Priority number, date | US201916730713 | 30.12.2019 Original published format: US201916730713 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021137881 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884487 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/31, G11B5/00, G11B5/127 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
G11B5/315 (EP,US);
G11B5/112 (CN);
G11B5/11 (US);
G11B5/1278 (EP,US);
G11B5/3116 (CN);
G11B5/3133 (US);
G11B5/314 (US);
G11B5/3146 (US);
G11B5/3153 (EP,US);
G11B5/35 (US);
G11B5/65 (CN);
G11B5/70605 (CN);
G11B2005/0024 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/39] | G11B5/31, G11B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | MAMR-AUFZEICHNUNGSKOPF MIT STARTSCHICHT MIT HOHER DÄMPFUNG DER HINTEREN ABSCHIRMUNG | [2021/39] | English: | MAMR RECORDING HEAD WITH HIGH DAMPING TRAILING SHIELD SEED LAYER | [2021/39] | French: | TÊTE D'ENREGISTREMENT MAMR À COUCHE GERME DE PROTECTION ARRIÈRE À AMORTISSEMENT ÉLEVÉ | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009257154 (CAREY MATTHEW J [US], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US9355654 (MALLARY MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, lines 1-49; figures 2A, 2B * * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 27 *; | [A]US2018144768 (LIU YUE [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0032] - [0041] *; | [A]US2019251992 (HO MICHAEL KUOK SAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] * | International search | [Y]US2009257154 (CAREY MATTHEW J [US], et al) [Y] 1-20; | [A]US2011216447 (LI MIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2013222949 (BRAGANCA PATRICK MESQUITA [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2018323371 (LIU HUANLONG [US], et al)[A] 1-20; | [Y]US2019147907 (LI ZHANJIE [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 | by applicant | US2019251992 |