EP4071697 - DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, MANAGEMENT METHOD, AND MANAGEMENT PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOPCON CORPORATION 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOJI Atsushi c/o TOPCON CORPORATION, 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA Toshio c/o TOPCON CORPORATION, 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 03 /
NISHITA Nobuyuki c/o TOPCON CORPORATION, 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 04 /
YANOBE Satoshi c/o TOPCON CORPORATION, 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 05 /
KANEKO Junki c/o TOPCON CORPORATION, 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20894995.8 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020JP44194 | Priority number, date | JP20190218514 | 03.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019218514 | [2022/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021111999 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071697 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/10, G06F30/13, // G06Q50/08 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
G06F30/13 (EP);
G06F16/211 (US);
G06F16/25 (US);
G06Q50/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | G06Q50/08, G06F30/10, G06F30/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | DATENVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM, VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWALTUNGSPROGRAMM | [2022/41] | English: | DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, MANAGEMENT METHOD, AND MANAGEMENT PROGRAM | [2022/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION, PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION ET PROGRAMME DE GESTION DE DONNÉES | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | Translation filed | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2014005985 (ISHIDA TOMOTOSHI [JP]); | International search | [A]JP2012068047 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [YA]JP2014010588 (HITACHI LTD); | by applicant | JP2019021190 |