EP4071429 - STAGE FOR HEATING AND COOLING OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advantec Co., Ltd. Marunouchi Trust Tower Main Building 25F 1-8-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000005 / JP | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA Yuji c/o ADVANTEC CO., LTD., Marunouchi Trust Tower Main Building 25F, 1-8-3 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Peters, Sebastian Martinus Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20895154.1 | 23.10.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020JP39995 | Priority number, date | JP20190221514 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019221514 | [2022/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021111760 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071429 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F26B23/00, H01L21/3065, H01L21/67, C23C16/46, C23C14/54, C23C16/54, C23C16/458, C23C14/50 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H01L21/67103 (EP);
C23C16/463 (EP,US);
C23C14/50 (EP);
C23C14/541 (EP);
C23C16/4583 (US);
C23C16/4586 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | F26B23/00, H01L21/3065, H01L21/683, C23C16/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | TISCH FÜR HEIZUNG UND KÜHLUNG EINES OBJEKTS | [2022/41] | English: | STAGE FOR HEATING AND COOLING OBJECT | [2022/41] | French: | ÉTAGE DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'OBJET | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2022 | Translation filed | 27.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 03.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007090516 (WHITE JOHN M [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1,8,19 *[I] 4,5 | International search | [Y]JPH06260430 (EIKO KK, et al) [Y] 3 * [0 0 2 6 ], 1, 2 *; | [XY]JPH1050811 (MIYATA R ANDEI KK) [X] 1,2,6-8 * [0002] - [0 0 2 4], 1-17 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]JP2000021890 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO, et al) [Y] 3-5* 45 33-49 2, 70-75 *; | [Y]JP2007043042 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [Y] 3 * [0034]-[0037], 3-5 *; | [XY]KR20100137795 (THERMTECS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * [0 0 0 2], [0021], [0 0 3 1 ], [0041], 1, 2 * [Y] 3-5 | by applicant | JPS519589B | JPH0255964B | JP3064993B | JP3956697B | JP4604752B | JP5169757B | JP5173757B | JP5386044B | JP5427367B | JP6498053B |