EP4071126 - BONDED SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BONDED SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBIGASE, Takashi c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD., 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA, Izumi c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD., 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
KAKU, Takeshi c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD., 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20895410.7 | 03.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020JP45073 | Priority number, date | WO2019JP47117 | 03.12.2019 Original published format: PCT/JP2019/047117 | [2022/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021112187 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071126 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C04B37/02, B23K1/00, H01L23/13, H01L23/14, H05K3/38 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
C04B37/026 (EP);
H01L23/49811 (CN);
H01L23/15 (EP,US);
B23K1/00 (EP);
C04B35/584 (EP,US);
C04B35/645 (EP);
H01L21/4846 (CN);
H01L21/4871 (EP);
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H01L23/49838 (CN);
H01L23/49894 (CN);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
C04B2235/85 (EP);
C04B2237/125 (EP);
C04B2237/127 (EP);
C04B2237/368 (EP);
C04B2237/407 (EP);
C04B2237/59 (EP);
C04B2237/61 (EP);
C04B2237/708 (EP);
H05K3/022 (EP);
H05K3/38 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | GEBUNDENES SUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEBUNDENEN SUBSTRATS | [2022/41] | English: | BONDED SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BONDED SUBSTRATE | [2022/41] | French: | SUBSTRAT LIÉ ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN SUBSTRAT LIÉ | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2022 | Translation filed | 26.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5998000 (IKEDA KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figure 13; examples 21-23 * [A] 8,9; | [X]JP6295382B (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [X] 1-7,9 * paragraphs [0050] - [0051] *; | [E]EP4197990 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [E] 1-7,9* paragraph [0131]; example 1 * | International search | [A]WO2013008920 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* entire text *; | [A]WO2014175459 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * entire text *; | [A]WO2015029478 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * entire text *; | [A]JP2015164184 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1-9 * entire text *; | [A]WO2017213207 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-9 * entire text *; | [A]JP2018140929 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-9 * entire text *; | [A]JP2018160706 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1-9 * entire text *; | [A]WO2018199060 (DENKA COMPANY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * entire text *; | [A]WO2018221493 (DENKA COMPANY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * entire text *; | [A]JP2019104680 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1-9 * entire text * | by applicant | JP2002201076 | JP2015164184 |