EP4070499 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND MEDIA FOR IDENTIFICATION, DISAMBIGUATION, VERIFICATION AND FOR COMMUNICATING KNOWLEDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ziebell, William J. 999 W Main Street, Suite 1000 Boise, Idaho 83702 / US | For all designated states Ziebell, Angela M. 999 W Main Street, Suite 100 Boise, Idaho 83702 / US | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | White, Jonathan Patrick JP White Intellectual Property Limited 25-27 Fitzwilliam Hall Fitzwilliam Place Dublin 2, D02 T292 / IE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20896020.3 | 03.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020US63148 | Priority number, date | US201962944641P | 06.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962944641 P | US202063031419P | 28.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063031419 P | US202017110107 | 02.12.2020 Original published format: US202017110107 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021113534 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070499 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
G06F16/2291 (EP,US);
G06F16/24575 (EP,US);
G06F16/2282 (US);
G06F16/24573 (EP,US);
G06F21/64 (EP);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND MEDIEN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG, UNTERSCHEIDUNG, ÜBERPRÜFUNG UND ZUR KOMMUNIKATION VON WISSEN | [2022/41] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND MEDIA FOR IDENTIFICATION, DISAMBIGUATION, VERIFICATION AND FOR COMMUNICATING KNOWLEDGE | [2022/41] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET SUPPORTS D'IDENTIFICATION, DE DÉSAMBIGUÏSATION, DE VÉRIFICATION ET DE COMMUNICATION DE CONNAISSANCES | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 05.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.08.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.08.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018034802 (SHELTON BARRY K [US]); | [A]US10169566 (MOSSOBA MICHAEL [US], et al) | International search | [X]US2005114666 (SUDIA FRANK W [US]); | [A]US2017075938 (BLACK TRON [US], et al); | [A]US2018077129 (BAUM AVRAHAM [IS], et al) | by applicant | US2018034802 |