EP4072005 - POWER CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT SYSTEMS CO., LTD. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOBARI, Kazuaki Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
ONUMA, Yusaku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 03 /
SUGIMOTO, Takuya Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 04 /
TOKASHIKI, Mutsuo Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20897399.0 | 10.09.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020JP34294 | Priority number, date | JP20190220626 | 05.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019220626 | [2022/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021111695 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072005 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02P21/00, H02P21/26, H02P21/14, H02P21/18 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H02P21/141 (EP,CN);
H02P21/0017 (EP);
H02P21/0085 (EP);
H02P21/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | H02P21/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | STROMUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/41] | English: | POWER CONVERSION DEVICE | [2022/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | Translation filed | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11151000 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017056649 (HITACHI INDUSTRY EQUIPMENT SYSTEMS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [IA]JP2017153273 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [I] 1,6-12 * the whole document * [A] 2-5; | [A]JP2019022446 (HITACHI INDUSTRY EQUIPMENT SYSTEMS CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [YA]JPH09163782 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1, 6-12 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0010], [0013]-[0029], fig. 1 * [A] 2-5; | [Y]JPH11151000 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1, 6-12 * , paragraphs [0007]-[0013], fig. 1 *; | [Y]JP2017070118 (HITACHI INDUSTRY EQUIPMENT SYSTEMS CO LTD) [Y] 12* , paragraphs [0037]-[0064], fig. 8, 10 *; | [Y]JP2019022446 (HITACHI INDUSTRY EQUIPMENT SYSTEMS CO LTD) [Y] 10-11 * , paragraphs [0009], [0056]-[0059], [0102], [0104], fig. 1, 3, 7, 8 * | by applicant | JP2016032364 |