EP4081240 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING PULMONARY HYPERTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acceleron Pharma Inc. 128 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Gang 39 Dawson Drive Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Ravindra 421 Arlington Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20897464.2 | 03.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020US63160 | Priority number, date | US201962943013P | 03.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962943013 P | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021113544 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081240 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, C07K14/51, C07K14/71, A61K39/395, A61K47/68, A61K31/7088, A61P9/12, A61P11/00, A61K38/17, A61K45/06 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61P9/12 (EP,AU,US);
A61K38/179 (EP,AU,US);
A61K38/177 (EP);
A61K38/1796 (EP);
A61K38/1875 (EP,AU);
A61K45/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | A61K38/18, C07K14/51, C07K14/71, A61K39/395, A61K47/68, A61K31/7088, A61P9/12, A61P11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN VON PULMONALER HYPERTONIE | [2022/44] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING PULMONARY HYPERTENSION | [2022/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERTENSION PULMONAIRE | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 23.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017149306 (CAMBRIDGE ENTPR LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 4; claims 1-23 *; | [Y] - HE JIANG ET AL, "The Prodomain-bound Form of Bone Morphogenetic Protein 10 Is Biologically Active on Endothelial Cells", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20160205), vol. 291, no. 6, doi:10.1074/jbc.M115.683292, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2954 - 2966, XP055684048 [Y] 1-14 * page 2955, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 2964, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 2956, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M115.683292 | International search | [X]WO2010128158 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 2-3 * Abstract, page 2 para. 3, page 11 para. 2 *; | [X]WO2012145539 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 2-3, 17-20, 24-26, 45 * page 40 para. 1, page 52 lines 30-31, page 53 lines 14-15, Figure 13, pages 21-22, SEQ ID NOs: 36, 35, 34, 33 *; | [X]WO2016005756 (CAMBRIDGE ENTPR LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,21-23 * page 9 lines 9-11, page 24 lines 31-36, page 25 lines 1-8, claims 3, 9, SEQ ID NO: 2 in Sequence Listing *; | [X]WO2016054406 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 9-10 * page 35, Examples *; | [X]US2017137503 (SEEHRA JASBIR [US], et al) [X] 2-3, 15-16, 24-26, 44 * Examples 1-2, 12, 13, SEQ ID NOs: 5 and 3 in the Sequence Listing *; | [X]WO2017176938 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US]) [X] 2-3, 13-14, 24-26, 43 * Abstract, page 3 para. 3, page 5 para.2, pages 59-61, SEQ ID NOs: 14 and 16 *; | [X]WO2018013936 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US]) [X] 1-4, 27-42 * Example 1, in particular page 151 para. 3, Examples 14-15, page 7 lines 29-34, pages 8-9, claims *; | [X]WO2018144968 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US]) [X] 2, 13-26, 43-46 * Examples 3-8, in particular, the sequences disclosed in the Examples *; | [A]WO2019086331 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-46* Abstract, Examples 2, 9-10 *; | [X]WO2019117208 (KYOWA HAKKO KIRIN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12,27-42; | [X] - Tu Ly, Desroches-Castan Agnès, Mallet Christine, Guyon Laurent, Cumont Amélie, Phan Carole, Robert Florian, Thuillet Raphaël, Bordenave Jennifer, Sekine Ayumi, Huertas Alice, Ritvos Olli, Savale Laurent, Feige Jean-Jacques, Humbert Marc, Bailly Sabine, Guignabert Christophe, "Selective BMP-9 inhibition partially protects against experimental pulmonary hypertension", CIRCULATION RESEARCH, GRUNE AND STRATTON, US, (20190315), vol. 124, no. 6, doi:10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.118.313356, ISSN 0009-7330, pages 846 - 855, XP055834375 [X] 1-4, 15, 29-32 * . Abstract, pages 849-851, Figure 3C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.118.313356 | [X] - Ayumi Sekine, Ly Tu, Christine Mallet, Jennifer Bordenave, Raphael Thuillet, Carole Phan, Paul-Benoit Poble, Alice Huertas, Marc Humbert, Sabine Bailly, Christophe Guignabert, "Contribution of BMP9 to Pulmonary Arterial Hypertension", European Respiratory Journal, (20170101), vol. 50, no. Suppl 61, doi:10.1183/1393003.congress-2017.OA4658, ISSN 0903-1936, page OA 4658, XP009529612 [X] 1-4, 15, 24-25 * .OA4658 The entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1183/1393003.congress-2017.OA4658 | [A] - Nikolic Ivana, Yung Lai-Ming, Yang Peiran, Malhotra Rajeev, Paskin-Flerlage Samuel D., Dinter Teresa, Bocobo Geoffrey A., Tumelty Kathleen E., Faugno Anthony J., Troncone Luca, Mcneil Megan E., Huang Xiuli, Coser Kathryn R., Lai Carol S. C., Upton Paul D., Goumans Marie Jose, Zamanian Roham T., Elliott C. Gregory, Lee Arthur, Zheng Wei, Berasi Stephen P., Huard Christine, Morrell Nicholas W., Chung Raymond T., Channick Richard W., Roberts Kari E., Yu Paul B., "Bone Morphogenetic Protein 9 Is a Mechanistic Biomarker of Portopulmonary Hypertension", American Journal of Respiratory and Critical Care Medicine, US, (20190401), vol. 199, no. 7, doi:10.1164/rccm.201807-1236OC, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 891 - 902, XP055834433 [A] 1-46 * . Abstract, page 898, page 899 middle and right column, page 900 right column para. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/rccm.201807-1236OC | [A] - Li, Wei; Salmon, Richard M.; Jiang, He; Morrell, Nicholas W., "Regulation of the ALK1 ligands, BMP9 and BMP10", Biochemical Society Transactions, (20160815), vol. 44, no. 4, doi:10.1042/BST20160083, ISSN 0300-5127, pages 1135 - 1141, XP009529617 [A] 1-46 * . page 1138 left column, page 1138 right column para. 1, page 1139 right column para. 3, page 1140 left column para. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BST20160083 | [A] - Mark L. Ormiston, Paul D. Upton, Wei Li, Nicholas W. Morrell, "The promise of recombinant BMP ligands and other approaches targeting BMPR-II in the treatment of pulmonary arterial hypertension", GLOBAL CARDIOLOGY SCIENCE & PRACTICE 2013, (20150901), vol. 2015, no. 4, doi:10.5339/gcsp.2015.47, ISSN 2305-7823, page 47, XP055368628 [A] 1-46 * page 2 para. 3 until page 3 para. 4, page 6 para. 5 until page 8 para. 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5339/gcsp.2015.47 |