EP4057632 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Ryohei c/o SONY CORPORATION, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
HIRABAYASHI, Mitsuhiro c/o SONY CORPORATION, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20897758.7 | 11.12.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020JP46249 | Priority number, date | US201962947910P | 13.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962947910 P | [2022/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021117859 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4057632 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/854, H04N21/81, H04N19/597, H04N19/70 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP);
H04N21/2389 (US);
H04N21/816 (EP);
H04N21/85406 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | H04N21/2389, H04N19/597 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2022/37] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD | [2022/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2022 | Translation filed | 24.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 02.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2021141208 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | US2021227232 [ ] (OH SEJIN [KR], et al); | [E]WO2021211665 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS INC [US]); | International search | [A]JP2018198421 (THOMSON LICENSING); | [A]WO2019094184 (INTERDIGITAL VC HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [A]WO2019142834 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); | [A]EP3540696 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); | [A]US2019318488 (LIM YOUNGKWON [US], et al) |