EP4072741 - APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING VISCOUS FLUID AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING VISCOUS FLUID WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tonsan Adhesive, Inc. No. 5 Shuangyuan Road Badachu High-Tech Zone Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jing Shengtai Xinyuan North District, 418 Jianguo Road Guangyang District Langfang, Hebei 065000 / CN | 02 /
LI, Zhenzhong Shengtai Xinyuan South District, 166 Jiefang Road Guangyang District Langfang, Hebei 065000 / CN | 03 /
HU, Yutao Building 16, Zone 1, Pingguoyuan Community, Shijingshan District Beijing 100000 / CN | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/42] | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20898010.2 | 08.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020CN134487 | Priority number, date | CN201911249856 | 09.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911249856 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021115251 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072741 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/01, B65D35/28, B05C17/005 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
B05C17/0103 (EP,US);
B65D35/285 (CN);
B05C17/00556 (EP,US);
B05C17/00553 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | B05C17/01, B65D35/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE EINER VISKOSEN FLÜSSIGKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE EINER VISKOSEN FLÜSSIGKEIT DAMIT | [2022/42] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING VISCOUS FLUID AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING VISCOUS FLUID WITH THE SAME | [2022/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE VISQUEUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE VISQUEUX AVEC CELUI-CI | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 28.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]NO820314L (KOEMMERLING KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,11-15 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,7,8 [I] 3; | [X]CA1304352 (GURIT ESSEX AG [CH]) [X] 1,9-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 33] ** figure 1 * |