EP4074197 - SUSCEPTOR FOR AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE AND AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd. 1-3 F, Building C Gaoxin Industry Zone Tangwei Village Fuyong Town Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Tao Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park,Fuyong Str,Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
HE, Huanjie Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park,Fuyong Str,Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
LI, Junhui Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park,Fuyong Str,Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Hanliang Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park,Fuyong Str,Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 05 /
LEI, Baoling Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park,Fuyong Str,Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 06 /
QI, Zuqiang Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park,Fuyong Str,Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 07 /
XU, Zhongli Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park,Fuyong Str,Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 08 /
LI, Yonghai Bldg C,Tangwei High-Tech Park,Fuyong Str,Baoan Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20898211.6 | 09.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020CN134983 | Priority number, date | CN201922190772U | 09.12.2019 Original published format: CN 201922190772 U | CN20201007108 | 03.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010007108 | [2022/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021115339 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074197 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24F40/51, A24F40/465 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
A24F40/51 (EP,US);
A24F40/465 (EP,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,US);
H05B6/06 (EP);
H05B6/105 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | A24F40/40, A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | SUSZEPTOR FÜR AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/42] | English: | SUSCEPTOR FOR AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE AND AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE | [2022/42] | French: | SUSCEPTEUR POUR DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2022 | Translation filed | 08.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 16.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3357359 (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO [CN]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A]EP3469936 (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * |