EP4073901 - ENGINEERED POWER ON DEMAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westgen Technologies Inc. 1600, 205 5th Avenue SW Calgary, Alberta T2P 2V7 / CA | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'SHEA, Connor Stanford 4639 19 Avenue NW Calgary, Alberta T3B 0S4 / CA | 02 /
KLEPACKI, Benjamin David 85 Evergreen Mount SW Calgary, Alberta T2Y 0K1 / CA | 03 /
HOWARD, Craig Antony 607 West Highland Crescent P.O. Box 1826 Carstairs, Alberta T0M 0N0 / CA | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Barnes IP Limited Castle Hill House 12 Castle Hill Windsor, Berkshire SL4 1PD / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20899114.1 | 31.03.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020CA50420 | Priority number, date | US201962945694P | 09.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962945694 P | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021113953 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4073901 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F02B63/04, H02J9/06, E21B43/00, F02M21/02, H02J3/38, H02J7/35, H02K7/18 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
F02B63/044 (EP);
H02J9/061 (US);
F01M9/00 (US);
F02B63/048 (US);
F02M21/0227 (EP,US);
F02M25/00 (US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J7/35 (EP);
H02J9/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | H02J9/06, E21B41/00, H02J7/35, H02K7/18, H02M7/68, F02B63/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | TECHNISIERTE ENERGIE AUF ANFRAGE | [2022/42] | English: | ENGINEERED POWER ON DEMAND | [2022/42] | French: | PUISSANCE MODIFIÉE À LA DEMANDE | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 06.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001304001 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD); | [XYI]US2014116870 (KAMEN DEAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2015138308 (LINDE AG [DE], et al) | International search | [A]CN101286655 (INST ELECTRICAL ENG CAS [CN]) [A] 0 * Whole document * [A] 0; | [XY]US2008278003 (POUCHET JACK H [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 8-11, 17 and 18 * Abstract, paragraphs 0016 and 0026 * [Y] 6, 7, 12-14 and 19-24; | [A]CN101309017 (INST ELECTRICAL ENG CAS [CN]) [A] 0 * Whole document *; | [XY]GB2516414 (MEB ENGINEERING & COMMERCIAL SERVICES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5, 8-11, 17 and 18 * Paragraphs 0001, 0012, 0015, 0046-0048 * [Y] 6, 7, 12-14 and 19-24; | [Y]WO2015138308 (LINDE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 6, 7, 13, 14, 19-24 * Abstract, Claims 1 and 5 *; | [XY]AU2015101163 (CHEN MARCO [US]) [X] 1-3, 10, 11, 17 and 18 * "Background of the invention", first paragraph, Claim 1 * [Y] 4-9, 12-14 and 19-24; | [XY]CN105356573 (QINGDAO LANGXIN ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 8-11, 17 and 18 * Abstract, Figure 1, Claims 1 and 2 * [Y] 6, 7, 12-14 and 19-24; | [Y]US2016190867 (GINART ANTONIO EFRAIN [US], et al) [Y] 12, 13, 19-24 * Abstract *; | [A]WO2019107802 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 0 * Whole document *; | [A]US2019237995 (AKITA TETSUO [JP], et al) [A] 0* Whole document * | by applicant | JP2001304001 | US2014116870 | WO2015138308 |