EP4075452 - CONDUCTIVE FILM AND WOUND BODY THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000006 / JP | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Tsuneharu c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20900273.2 | 09.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020JP45889 | Priority number, date | JP20190222618 | 10.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019222618 | [2022/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021117775 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4075452 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01B5/14, B32B7/025, G06F3/041 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/041 (EP);
G06F1/1652 (US);
G06F2203/04102 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04112 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | H01B5/14, B32B7/025 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGER FILM UND GEWICKELTER KÖRPER DAFÜR | [2022/42] | English: | CONDUCTIVE FILM AND WOUND BODY THEREOF | [2022/42] | French: | FILM CONDUCTEUR ET CORPS ENROULÉ COMPOSÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2022 | Translation filed | 30.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 25.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016044778 (IRIE TOORU [JP], et al); | [A]KR20160135317 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2016108568 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD); | [X]JP2017019273 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2010192841 | JP2016051194 | JP2017019273 |