Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.05.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
17.02.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
17.02.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
08.02.2023 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.11.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
04.11.2022 | First examination report | |
26.10.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
21.10.2022 | Change - classification | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
21.10.2022 | Change - classification | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
19.10.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
16.09.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
16.09.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
23.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.05.2022 | Change - representative | |
30.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.06.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |