EP4071744 - ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIN, Bin No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20900446.4 | 11.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020CN135715 | Priority number, date | CN201911282297 | 13.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911282297 | [2022/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021115431 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071744 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/30, G06F1/16 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G09F9/301 (EP,CN);
G06F1/1652 (EP,US);
G06F1/1624 (EP);
G06F1/1637 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | G09F9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/41] | English: | ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2022/41] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2022 | Translation filed | 08.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 26.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016324021 (TAKAYANAGI TOSHIKAZU [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] , [0052] , [0053] , [0058] , [0066]; figures 1-6,9 *[I] 3; | [XI]CN110491289 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS SEMICONDUCTOR DISPLAY TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-13 * paragraphs [0058] - [0060]; figures 2a-2f,3a,3b * [I] 3,14,15 |