EP4131246 - DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Zhijian No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
AO, Yu No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
LI, Yunlong No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
LU, Pengcheng No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
TIAN, Yuanlan No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20900712.9 | 27.03.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020CN81878 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021189494 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131246 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10K59/123, G09G3/36, H10K59/131 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
H10K59/123 (EP);
H10K59/131 (EP,US);
H10K59/80518 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | G09G3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/06] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2023/06] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2021 | Translation filed | 23.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2019026511 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 8-10* paragraph [0072]; figure 10 *; | [A]US2019180692 (FUJII TAKUMA [JP], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0136]; figures 6-13 *; | [IY]WO2019214590 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-7,11-14 * abstract * [Y] 8-10; | US2021074790 [ ] (WANG WEIHAI [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0002]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0071]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0056]; figure 6 * | International search | [A]WO2007034599 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]CN103676251 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]CN103838043 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]CN203720494U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]CN104932765 (HEFEI XINSHENG OPTOELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]US2016070396 (HORADE NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* entire document *; | [X]CN106252525 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * description, paragraphs [0032]-[0053] and figures 3-10 *; | [A]CN206584328U (TRULY OPTO ELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]CN109545934 (XIANGNENG HUALEI OPTOELECTRONIC CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * entire document * |