EP3985554 - TRAFFIC LIGHT RECOGNITION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Xiaopeng Motors Technology Co., Ltd. 176 of Room 406 No. 1, Yichuang Street Sino-Singapore Knowledge City, Huangpu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510555 / CN | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states Guangdong Xiaopeng Motors Technology Co., Ltd. 176 of Room 406 No. 1, Yichuang Street Sino-Singapore Knowledge City, Huangpu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510555 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Weiwei Guangdong 510555 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Pengyue Guangdong 510555 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Langechuan Guangdong 510555 / CN | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Ran, Handong Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/16] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 20900756.6 | 16.10.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020CN121562 | Priority number, date | CN202010809487 | 12.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010809487 | [2022/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022032861 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3985554 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3985554 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/80, G06F18/25, G06V20/58 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
G06V20/584 (EP);
G06V20/00 (CN);
G06F18/25 (EP);
G06F18/256 (EP);
G06V10/751 (CN);
G06V10/80 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | G06K9/00, G06V20/58, G06K9/62 | ||
Former IPC [2022/16] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKEHRSAMPELERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/16] | English: | TRAFFIC LIGHT RECOGNITION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECONNAISSANCE DE FEU DE CIRCULATION | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2021 | Translation filed | 25.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 15.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2019080186 (ZHAI YUQIANG [CN], et al) [X] 1,8-10 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0137]; figures 1-5 *[A] 2-7; | [XI]US10339400 (CHAI HUAJUN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * column 3, line 55 - column 14, line 5; figures 1-6 * [I] 3-6 |