EP4053235 - ELECTRODE INORGANIC LAYER COATING TAPE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Yong Tae LG Chem Research Park, 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jun Soo LG Chem Research Park, 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Bum Young LG Chem Research Park, 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20901010.7 | 18.11.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020KR16241 | Priority number, date | KR20190169546 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190169546 | KR20200148524 | 09.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200148524 | [2022/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021125576 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053235 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/10, C08J7/04, C09D1/00, H01M4/139, H01M10/42, H01M4/04 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
C08J7/0427 (EP);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
C09D1/00 (US);
C09D7/61 (EP);
C09D7/63 (EP);
C09J11/04 (US);
C09J7/10 (EP);
C09J7/22 (US);
C09J7/405 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/42 (EP);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M4/04 (EP);
H01M4/0404 (EP);
H01M4/0435 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (EP);
H01M4/139 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP);
H01M4/623 (EP,US);
H01M4/628 (EP,US);
H01M50/461 (EP);
H01M50/586 (EP,US);
H01M50/595 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP);
C08J2427/16 (EP);
C08K3/013 (EP);
C08K5/0016 (EP);
C09D5/00 (EP);
C09J2203/33 (EP);
C09J2301/312 (US);
C09J2301/40 (US);
C09J2301/408 (EP);
C09J2427/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | C09J7/22, C09J11/04, C09J7/40, C09D1/00, H01M4/139, H01M10/42, H01M4/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENÜBERZUGSBAND MIT ANORGANISCHER SCHICHT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/36] | English: | ELECTRODE INORGANIC LAYER COATING TAPE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/36] | French: | RUBAN DE REVÊTEMENT DE COUCHE INORGANIQUE D'ÉLECTRODE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2022 | Translation filed | 03.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0132798 (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 10 - line 19 * * page 5, line 19 - line 24 * * page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 29; figure 1; example 3; claims 1-6,9,10,16 *; | [X]EP1193284 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0095] , [0096] , [0101] , [0108]; example 13; claims 1,2,11,14,18 *; | [X]WO2010035614 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-15 * abstract * * pages 1,2,10 - page 12; claims 1,2,7,8,12-14 * | International search | [A]JP2000100437 (DAICEL CHEM) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [A]JP2000276944 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [A]JP2003151578 (TOTO LTD) [A] 5,8,10-13,15-20; | [A]KR20110040141 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20* See entire document. *; | [A]KR20190066410 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. * | by applicant | KR20080105853 | JP2012238396 | KR20140028754 | KR20180077030 | KR20190169546 | KR20200148524 |