EP4079925 - ALUMINUM-IRON-PLATED STEEL SHEET, HAVING EXCELLENT MOLD WEAR RESISTANCE, FOR HOT PRESS FORMING, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Jin-Keun c/o Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 20-26, Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seong-Woo c/o Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 20-26, Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Sang-Heon c/o Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 20-26, Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | 04 /
CHUN, Hyo-Sik c/o Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 20-26, Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20901363.0 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020KR18554 | Priority number, date | KR20190172334 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190172334 | [2022/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021125832 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4079925 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/26, C23C2/28, C23C2/12, C23C2/40, C22C21/00, C22C38/32, C22C38/28, C22C38/04, C22C38/00, B32B15/01 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
C23C2/261 (EP,US);
C23C2/50 (KR);
C23C2/29 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/012 (EP);
C21D9/46 (US);
C22C21/00 (EP,KR);
C22C21/02 (US);
C22C38/001 (KR,US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/008 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/08 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C22C38/28 (KR);
C22C38/32 (KR);
C22C38/38 (EP);
C22C38/60 (EP);
C23C2/12 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/26 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/28 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/40 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/405 (EP);
C23C28/02 (EP);
C23C28/023 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | C23C2/26, C23C2/28, C23C2/12, C23C2/40, C22C21/00, C22C38/32, C22C38/28, C22C38/04, C22C38/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUM-EISEN-PLATTIERTES STAHLBLECH MIT AUSGEZEICHNETER FORMVERSCHLEISSFESTIGKEIT ZUM HEISSPRESSFORMEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/43] | English: | ALUMINUM-IRON-PLATED STEEL SHEET, HAVING EXCELLENT MOLD WEAR RESISTANCE, FOR HOT PRESS FORMING, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2022/43] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER PLAQUÉE ALUMINIUM-FER PRÉSENTANT UNE EXCELLENTE RÉSISTANCE À L'USURE DU MOULE POUR LE FORMAGE À CHAUD ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2022 | Translation filed | 22.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20140083814 (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 6,7,15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0039] ** paragraphs [0048] - [0052]; claims 1-6,8-11 *; | [Y]EP3396010 (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 6,7,15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0046] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0073] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0078] * * example 1; claims 1-9,13-18 *; | [IY]KR20190077928 (POSCO [KR]) [I] 1-5,8-14 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0114] * * paragraphs [0125] - [0149] * * paragraphs [0154] - [0159] * * paragraphs [0168] - [0196] * * claims 1-12 * [Y] 6,7,15; | [A]EP3561116 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-15 * * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0061] * | International search | [A]KR20010085282 (NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION) [A] 1-18 * See claims 1 and 13. *; | [A]JP2006051543 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-18* See paragraph [0014] and claim 1. *; | [Y]KR20140083814 (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 1-14,16,18 * See claim 5. *; | [Y]KR101696121B (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 1-14,16,18 * See claim 13. *; | [A]KR20190077928 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 15,17 | by applicant | US6296805 |