EP4076838 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DRILLING HOLES AND INSTALLING FASTENERS IN VEHICLE STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spirit AeroSystems, Inc. 3801 South Oliver Street Wichita, KS 67210 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROEDER, Matthew R. 3801 South Oliver Street Wichita, Kansas 67210 / US | 02 /
JARAMILLO, Todd B. 3801 South Oliver Street Wichita, Kansas 67210 / US | 03 /
PRICE, John Adam 3801 South Oliver Street Wichita, Kansas 67210 / US | 04 /
DYE III, John Robert 3801 South Oliver Street Wichita, Kansas 67210 / US | 05 /
KIMBALL, Kaleb Aaron 3801 South Oliver Street Wichita, Kansas 67210 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20901743.3 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020US64769 | Priority number, date | US201916718493 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: US201916718493 | US201916718511 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: US201916718511 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021126733 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076838 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B23P23/00, B23P19/06, B23B45/02 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B23B45/00 (EP,KR);
B21J15/02 (EP);
B21J15/045 (KR);
B21J15/142 (EP,KR);
B21J15/147 (EP,KR);
B21J15/18 (EP,KR);
B21J15/28 (EP,KR);
B21J15/32 (EP,KR);
B21J15/36 (EP,KR);
B21J15/44 (EP);
B23B49/02 (EP,KR);
B23P19/06 (EP,KR);
B23B2215/04 (EP,KR);
B23B2270/32 (EP,KR);
B23B2270/36 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BOHREN VON LÖCHERN UND INSTALLIEREN VON BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTEN BEI FAHRZEUGSTRUKTUREN | [2022/43] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DRILLING HOLES AND INSTALLING FASTENERS IN VEHICLE STRUCTURES | [2022/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PERÇAGE DE TROUS ET D'INSTALLATION D'ÉLÉMENTS DE FIXATION DANS DES STRUCTURES DE VÉHICULE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008267728 (ERIKSSON INGVAR [SE], et al); | [Y]CN102036787 (MAX CO LTD); | [Y]EP2121225 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]); | [I]US2014025196 (HAIN JOCHEN [DE], et al); | [I]CA2952689 (BOEING CO [US]) | International search | [Y]KR0157767B (DAEWOO MOTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US2006024122 (NEALON JOSEPH M [US], et al); | [Y]JP2007087249 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]US2009112925 (AMIREHTESHAMI DAVID H [US], et al); | [A]US2017106452 (ANDERSSON HANS-PETTER [SE], et al) | by applicant | US2008267728 | CN102036787 | EP2121225 | US2014025196 |